NE LB297 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB297 amended into LB43 by AM2076
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB297 amended into LB43 by AM2076
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Personal Privacy Protection Act
Title
Adopt the Personal Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB297 amended into LB43 by AM2076 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO471 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO468 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO472 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO470 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO467 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO469 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO466 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Lowe priority bill |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM633 filed |
2023-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM633 |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |