NE LB283 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to emergency expenditures by school districts and educational service units for emergency management purposes as prescribed
Title
Change provisions relating to emergency expenditures by school districts and educational service units for emergency management purposes as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Baker [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST33 |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Baker AM1535 adopted |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Baker AM1535 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 adopted |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER104 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER104 |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Baker AM631 adopted |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Baker AM631 filed |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |