NE LB27 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for state agency contracts and powers and duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts as prescribed
Title
Change requirements for state agency contracts and powers and duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB27 amended into LB151 by AM334 |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30717 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB27.pdf |