NE LB267 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a duty for the county board relating to deficient bridges and authorize a tax levy
Title
Provide a duty for the county board relating to deficient bridges and authorize a tax levy
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | La Grone AM2265 pending |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1245 pending |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | La Grone AM2265 pending |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | La Grone AM2265 filed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | La Grone MO143 withdrawn |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | La Grone MO143 Bracket until April 23, 2020 filed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1245 pending |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1245 pending |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1245 filed |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1245 |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 07, 2019 |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Dorn name added |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37503 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB267.pdf |