NE LB266 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate provisions relating to increases in local option sales tax rates
Title
Eliminate provisions relating to increases in local option sales tax rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB266 amended into LB104 by AM1484 |
2013-04-05 | Legislature | Chambers MO29 pending |
2013-03-28 | Legislature | Chambers MO29 Place on General File filed |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Murante name added |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Pirsch name added |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Ashford name added |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18677 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB266.pdf |