NE LB252 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a condition relating to advertisements by the state lottery
Title
Provide a condition relating to advertisements by the state lottery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 26, 2019 |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA55 withdrawn |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA55 filed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER71 adopted |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER71 filed |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER71 |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2019-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Geist priority bill |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |