NE LB233 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide sales and use tax collection duties for certain peer-to-peer rentals of vehicles
Title
Provide sales and use tax collection duties for certain peer-to-peer rentals of vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-18 | Legislature | Friesen AM702 filed |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |