NE LB228 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act
Title
Change the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 21-009 to Morfeld |
2021-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |