NE LB203 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to a game refuge
Title
Change provisions relating to a game refuge
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |