NE LB164 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit electronic transmission or online posting of certain photographs or videos, redefine sexual exploitation, and provide for a registrable offense under the Sex Offender Registration Act
Title
Prohibit electronic transmission or online posting of certain photographs or videos, redefine sexual exploitation, and provide for a registrable offense under the Sex Offender Registration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37396 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB164.pdf |