NE LB131 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 02, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 02, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Cash Reserve Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the Cash Reserve Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-03-27 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-1-5 | |
2012-03-19 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-03-16 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-16 | Krist FA55 withdrawn | |
2012-03-16 | Krist FA55 filed | |
2012-03-16 | Flood AM2493 adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Haar FA54 lost | |
2012-03-16 | Haar FA54 filed | |
2012-03-16 | Council FA53 lost | |
2012-03-16 | Council FA53 pending | |
2012-03-16 | Council FA53 filed | |
2012-03-16 | Flood AM2493 pending | |
2012-03-16 | Flood FA40 withdrawn | |
2012-03-16 | Enrollment and Review ER210 adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Flood AM2493 filed | |
2012-03-15 | Enrollment and Review ER210 filed | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on Select File with ER210 | |
2012-03-14 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-14 | Cornett FA44 withdrawn | |
2012-03-14 | Flood FA41 withdrawn | |
2012-03-14 | Cornett FA45 withdrawn | |
2012-03-14 | Appropriations AM2098 adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Cornett FA45 filed | |
2012-03-08 | Cornett FA44 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Flood FA41 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Flood FA40 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Appropriations AM2098 filed | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on General File with AM2098 | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB131 amended into LB379 by AM1250 | |
2011-01-27 | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |