NE LB1254 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a professional learning system and regional coaches for teaching students to read
Title
Provide for a professional learning system and regional coaches for teaching students to read
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |