NE LB1228 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1228 amended into LB1344 by AM3191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1228 amended into LB1344 by AM3191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Good Life Transformational Projects Act
Title
Change the Good Life Transformational Projects Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1228 amended into LB1344 by AM3191 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |