NE LB1181 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1181 amended into LB881 by AM2628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1181 amended into LB881 by AM2628
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Fair Sentencing Act and change provisions relating to mandatory minimums, the habitual criminal enhancement, and pretrial detention
Title
Adopt the Fair Sentencing Act and change provisions relating to mandatory minimums, the habitual criminal enhancement, and pretrial detention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1181 amended into LB881 by AM2628 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40767 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1181.pdf |