NE LB1170 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for implicit bias training, coverage under the medical assistance program for doula services and postpartum women, instruction to health professionals, and a pilot program
Title
Provide for implicit bias training, coverage under the medical assistance program for doula services and postpartum women, instruction to health professionals, and a pilot program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Cavanaugh MO184 Place on General File filed |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41328 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1170.pdf |