NE LB1160 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1160 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1160 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Environment and Energy for reverse osmosis systems
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Environment and Energy for reverse osmosis systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1160 amended into LB1014 by AM2330 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |