NE LB1151 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate a sunset provision under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act relating to certain first responder injuries
Title
Eliminate a sunset provision under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act relating to certain first responder injuries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-16 | Business and Labor priority bill | |
2012-01-23 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=16035 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1151.pdf |