NE LB114 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a standard and labeling restrictions for honey
Title
Provide a standard and labeling restrictions for honey
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | Presented to Governor on March 04, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-03-04 | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-24 | Dubas AM491 adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Dubas AM354 withdrawn | |
2011-02-24 | Enrollment and Review ER25 adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Dubas AM491 filed | |
2011-02-15 | Dubas AM354 filed | |
2011-02-15 | Enrollment and Review ER25 filed | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Select File with ER25 | |
2011-02-14 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-14 | Agriculture AM199 adopted | |
2011-02-11 | Agriculture AM199 pending | |
2011-02-03 | Agriculture AM199 filed | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on General File with AM199 | |
2011-01-18 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |