NE LB1120 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disqualify entities receiving federal funds from a high-population county or city of the metropolitan class from receiving such funds from the state
Title
Disqualify entities receiving federal funds from a high-population county or city of the metropolitan class from receiving such funds from the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |