NE LB112 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations to the Department of Health and Human Services for child advocacy centers
Title
State intent regarding appropriations to the Department of Health and Human Services for child advocacy centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB112 amended into LB814 by AM915 |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 21, 2023 |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |