NE LB1089 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for disposition of residual funds in class action litigation and charitable trusts
Title
Provide for disposition of residual funds in class action litigation and charitable trusts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 adopted |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER204 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |