NE LB1087 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Hospital Quality Assurance and Access Assessment Act and provide duties for the Nebraska Center for Nursing
Title
Adopt the Hospital Quality Assurance and Access Assessment Act and provide duties for the Nebraska Center for Nursing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Jacobson AM2760 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Jacobson FA243 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2404 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Jacobson AM2512 adopted (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Jacobson AM2760 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Jacobson FA243 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2404 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Legislature - Jacobson AM2512 adopted (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Hughes explanation of vote |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST42 recorded |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST42 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST42 |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Jacobson AM2760 adopted |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Jacobson FA243 adopted |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Jacobson FA243 to AM2760 filed |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER69 adopted |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Jacobson AM2760 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER69 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER69 |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2404 adopted |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Jacobson AM2512 adopted |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Jacobson AM2512 to AM2404 filed |
2024-02-13 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2404 filed |
2024-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2404 |
2024-02-13 | Legislature | Armendariz priority bill |
2024-02-05 | Legislature | Hardin name added |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Kauth name added |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Moser name added |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Dungan name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2024 |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Raybould name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Day name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |