NE LB1070 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for infrastructure related to rural workforce housing
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for infrastructure related to rural workforce housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |