ND SCR4004 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution for the amendment of section 24 of article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the distribution of income from the foundation aid stabilization fund; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The distribution of income from the foundation aid stabilization fund; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 29 | |
2011-02-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-01-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |