ND SCR4001 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Budget Section) A concurrent resolution authorizing the Budget Section of the Legislative Management to hold the required legislative hearings on state plans for the receipt and expenditure of new or revised block grants passed by Congress.
Title
(Budget Section) A concurrent resolution authorizing the Budget Section of the Legislative Management to hold the required legislative hearings on state plans for the receipt and expenditure of new or revised block grants passed by Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-04-13 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-04-13 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | House | Pursuant to HR 509, placed on the calendar without a recommendation |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |