ND SB2396 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 051
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 051
Summary
Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, S. Meyer A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for the purpose of implementing programs associated with the family impact initiative.
Title
Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, S. Meyer A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services for the purpose of implementing programs associated with the family impact initiative.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 037 nays 051 | |
2009-04-02 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 009 | |
2009-03-17 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 002 | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 004 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 05:30 | |
2009-02-05 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2396.html |