ND SB2388 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Returned to Senate (12)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 19-24.1-05, 19-24.1-18, 19-24.1-19, and 19-24.1-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reapplication for registered identification cards for marijuana and acts associated with marijuana not prohibited from employee discipline; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reapplication for registered identification cards for marijuana and acts associated with marijuana not prohibited from employee discipline; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-03-21HouseEmergency clause carried
2023-03-21HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 16
2023-03-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-03-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 4 3
2023-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-02-13HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2023-02-09SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2023-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:07
2023-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback