ND SB2327 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding parentage and adoption policies.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding parentage and adoption policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 04:20 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:42 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:33 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |