ND SB2314 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 49-19-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to common carrier use of eminent domain; and to amend and reenact section 49-19-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to common carrier use of eminent domain.
Title
Common carrier use of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Rep. Matthew Heilman [R] | Rep. SuAnn Olson [R] |
Rep. Brandon Prichard [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |