ND SB2310 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 43-09-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to inspections of electrical wiring installations.
Title
Inspections of electrical wiring installations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 3 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |