ND SB2309 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 57-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a primary residence property tax relief fund, a property tax credit for property used as a primary residence, and limitations on the true and full valuation of property for tax purposes; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 15.1-27-04.1, subsection 4 of section 21-10-13, subdivision c of subsection 1 of section 57-20-07.1, and section 57-51.1-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to determination of state school aid, information displayed on property tax statements, transfer of legacy fund earnings, and deposit of oil and gas tax revenues; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Determination of state school aid, information displayed on property tax statements, transfer of legacy fund earnings, and deposit of oil and gas tax revenues; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Sen. Doug Larsen [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] |
Rep. SuAnn Olson [R] | Rep. Brandon Prichard [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:55 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |