ND SB2309 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a domestic violence court pilot project; and to amend and reenact section 12-60-23, subsection 9 of section 12.1-31.2-01, subsections 1 and 3 of section 12.1-31.2-02, section 14-07.1-02, and subsections 4 and 5 of section 14-07.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance, transmittal, and registry of protection orders and orders prohibiting contact.
Title
The issuance, transmittal, and registry of protection orders and orders prohibiting contact.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |