ND SB2296 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 21-04-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pledge of security in place of depository bond; and to repeal section 21-04-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to records of securities.
Title
Records of securities.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] |
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/24 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |