ND SB2278 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact paragraph 4 of subdivision b of subsection 15 of section 57-02-08 and subdivision f of subsection 1 of section 57-02-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the farm home residence property tax exemption and the homestead credit to provide for the confidentiality of documents evidencing eligibility for the exemption and credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The farm home residence property tax exemption and the homestead credit to provide for the confidentiality of documents evidencing eligibility for the exemption and credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8 |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-03-25 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |