ND SB2249 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting participation in extracurricular activities by students who have committed a criminal offense.
Title
Prohibiting participation in extracurricular activities by students who have committed a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 54 nays 37 |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |