ND SB2245 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study to examine the desirability and feasibility of creating a state wetlands bank.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study to examine the desirability and feasibility of creating a state wetlands bank.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 8 |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |