ND SB2244 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 22 of section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a property tax exemption for certain property owned and occupied as a home by a blind person; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A property tax exemption for certain property owned and occupied as a home by a blind person; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |