ND SB2243 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 47-20.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of the practice of land surveying.
Title
The definition of the practice of land surveying.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |