ND SB2240 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-53 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to temporary emergency suspension of marriage and family therapists; and to amend and reenact section 43-53-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions from licensure for marriage and family therapists.
Title
Exceptions from licensure for marriage and family therapists.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |