ND SB2208 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-12-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mandating the attorney general to issue opinions requested by individual members of the legislative assembly.
Title
Mandating the attorney general to issue opinions requested by individual members of the legislative assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 2 |
2023-03-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 0 4 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:05 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |