ND SB2198 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-24-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the minimum age for snowmobile operators.
Title
The minimum age for snowmobile operators.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] |
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |