ND SB2195 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Klemin, Kretschmar A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 23-06.6-13 and section 23-06.6-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions and updates to the revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Klemin, Kretschmar A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 23-06.6-13 and section 23-06.6-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions and updates to the revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Ralph Kilzer [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Dave Nething [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Porter Weisz Kilichowski | |
2009-04-09 | Conf comm appointed Erbele J. Lee Marcellais | |
2009-04-09 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-24 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-24 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 084 nays 000 | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-03-17 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-01-30 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2195.html |