ND SB2185 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 27-20-44 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of parental rights.
Title
Termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |