ND SB2185 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.2, 15.1-21-02.4, and 15.1-21-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to high school graduation requirements.
Title
High school graduation requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 8 |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |