ND SB2183 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-52.1-04.20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee insulin drug benefits; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 26.1-36.6-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |