ND SB2159 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision d of subsection 2 of section 10-32.1-39, paragraph 1 of subdivision d of subsection 3 of section 10-32.1-39, and paragraph 1 of subdivision q of subsection 4 of section 10-32.1-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to management of a limited liability company; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Management of a limited liability company; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |