ND SB2133 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 18-10.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a volunteer fire department private donation and contribution fund; and to amend and reenact section 18-10-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to collection and auditing of rural fire district funds.
Title
Collection and auditing of rural fire district funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] |
Rep. Claire Cory [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 38 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:25 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |