ND SB2132 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-62 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to designation of a portion of the oil and gas impact grant fund for grants to cities of fewer than seven thousand five hundred population or counties of fewer than ten thousand population.
Title
Designation of a portion of the oil and gas impact grant fund for grants to cities of fewer than seven thousand five hundred population or counties of fewer than ten thousand population.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54 | |
2011-03-28 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 4 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |