ND SB2131 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and section 43-26.1-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks by the North Dakota board of physical therapy for physical therapist and physical therapist assistant applicants and licensees.
Title
Criminal history record checks by the North Dakota board of physical therapy for physical therapist and physical therapist assistant applicants and licensees.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 17 |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2017-02-23 | House | Request return from committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |