ND SB2124 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 6-09-38.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the achieving a better life experience plan.
Title
The achieving a better life experience plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |